WV SB619 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to rulemaking for unidentified and unclaimed remains in possession of Chief Medical Examiner
Title
Relating to rulemaking for unidentified and unclaimed remains in possession of Chief Medical Examiner
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Maynard [R] | Sen. Stephen Baldwin [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Richard Lindsay [D] |
Sen. Jack Woodrum [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 205) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | To House Government Organization |
2022-02-24 | House | To Government Organization |
2022-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 205) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-02-11 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-11 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |