WV SB605 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 93, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Permitting Secondary Schools Athletic Commission discipline schools for not following protocol for concussions and head injuries

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permitting Secondary School Activities Commission discipline schools for not following protocol for concussions and head injuries

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 622) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 276) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 93, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateTo Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-08HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 622)
2019-03-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-08HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-07HouseFrom House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar
2019-03-07HouseFrom Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar
2019-03-06HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-05HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-04HouseDo pass
2019-02-28HouseTo House Education
2019-02-28HouseTo Education
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-27SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-27SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 276)
2019-02-27SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-27SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-26SenateTarr Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote)
2019-02-26SenateRucker Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote)
2019-02-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-26SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-25SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-25SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-23SenateReported do pass
2019-02-14SenateTo Education
2019-02-14SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-14SenateTo Education
2019-02-14SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2965 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - To House Education

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18225aAmended CodeCitation Text
18225bAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback