WV SB601 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating generally to public employees grievance procedure
Title
Relating generally to public employees grievance procedure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 221) (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - Romano Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 215) (Y: 12 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-26 - Senate - Motion to reconsider amendment adopted (Roll No. 214) (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - Romano Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 213) (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - Romano Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 215) (Y: 12 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-26 - Senate - Motion to reconsider amendment adopted (Roll No. 214) (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - Romano Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 213) (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-03-29 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-03-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 221) |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Romano Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 215) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Motion to reconsider amendment adopted (Roll No. 214) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Romano Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 213) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Trump Floor amendment #2 adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Trump Floor amendment #1 adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 3/25/21 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-03-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
6C | 2 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
6C | 2 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
6C | 2 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |