WV SB567 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to enact the Nonprofit Adventure and Recreational Responsibility Act. It sets forth the responsibility and liability of any Congressionally chartered youth organizations with a facility of over six thousand acres in this state offering certain adventure and recreational activities carrying inherent risks, as well as those of related providers and participants. This article is new; therefore, strike-throughs and underscoring have been omitted.
Title
Creating Nonprofit Adventure and Recreational Responsibility Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Foster [D] | Sen. Mike Green [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Kessler [D] | Sen. William Laird [D] |
Sen. Randy White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-11 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 143, Acts, Regular Session, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-04-02 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 4/1/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-04-01 | To Governor 4/1/10 | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 4/1/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | House Message received | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-13 | House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 430) | |
2010-03-13 | Conference report received-House | |
2010-03-13 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-13 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2010-03-13 | Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 96) | |
2010-03-13 | Conference report filed - Senate | |
2010-03-13 | Conference report filed - House | |
2010-03-13 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-13 | To conference | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to House | |
2010-03-13 | Senate appoints conference committee: Laird, Palumbo, Barnes | |
2010-03-13 | Senate agreed to conference | |
2010-03-13 | House Message received | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-13 | House appointed conferees: Shook, Frazier, Ellem | |
2010-03-13 | House refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote) | |
2010-03-13 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-13 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2010-03-13 | Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote) | |
2010-03-13 | House Message received | |
2010-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-12 | Passed House (Roll No. 316) | |
2010-03-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-12 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-11 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-11 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-10 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-03-09 | With amendment, do pass | |
2010-03-05 | To House Judiciary | |
2010-03-05 | Do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2010-03-03 | To House Natural Resources | |
2010-03-03 | To Natural Resources then Judiciary | |
2010-03-03 | Introduced in House | |
2010-03-02 | Ordered to House | |
2010-03-02 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 27) | |
2010-03-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-02 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-01 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-02-26 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-26 | On 1st reading | |
2010-02-25 | Committee substitute reported | |
2010-02-12 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-12 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-12 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-02-12 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-12 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4470 (Same As) 2010-02-12 - To House Natural Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 16 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 16 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 16 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 16 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 16 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 16 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 16 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 16 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=567&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |