WV SB56 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-31 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-31 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to pay the National Board for Professional Teaching Standards salary bonus to the holders of certificates awarded to them during employment as a classroom teacher if they are subsequently employed as a school principal, or assistant school principal, or in another position in an instructional leadership capacity.
Title
Awarding National Board for Professional Teaching Standards salary bonus to certain teachers
Sponsors
Sen. Truman Chafin [D] | Sen. Larry Edgell [D] | Sen. Dan Foster [D] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] |
Sen. John Unger [D] | Sen. Erik Wells [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-31 | To House Education | |
2009-03-31 | To Education then Finance | |
2009-03-31 | Introduced in House | |
2009-03-30 | Ordered to House | |
2009-03-30 | Effective July 1, 2009 (Roll No. 3) | |
2009-03-30 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) | |
2009-03-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-03-30 | On 3rd reading | |
2009-03-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-03-27 | On 2nd reading | |
2009-03-26 | Read 1st time | |
2009-03-26 | On 1st reading | |
2009-03-25 | Committee substitute reported | |
2009-02-25 | To Finance | |
2009-02-25 | Reported do pass, with title amendment, but first to Finance | |
2009-02-11 | To Education | |
2009-02-11 | To Education then Finance | |
2009-02-11 | Introduced in Senate | |
2009-02-11 | To Education then Finance | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18A | 4 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=56&year=2009&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |