WV SB539 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB539

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 38, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Increasing limit for settling claims against DOH

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing limit for settling claims against DOH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 321) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 196) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateChapter 38, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
2018-03-10HouseApproved by Governor 3/22/18 - House Journal
2018-03-10SenateApproved by Governor 3/22/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-22SenateApproved by Governor 3/22/18
2018-03-10HouseTo Governor 3/9/18 - House Journal
2018-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/9/18
2018-03-06SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-05HouseCompleted legislative action
2018-03-05HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-05HousePassed House (Roll No. 321)
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-05HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-03HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-03HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-02HouseRead 1st time
2018-03-02HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-01HouseDo pass
2018-02-27HouseTo House Judiciary
2018-02-27HouseTo Judiciary
2018-02-27HouseIntroduced in House
2018-02-26SenateOrdered to House
2018-02-26SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 196)
2018-02-26SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-26SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-02-23SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-23SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-02-22SenateRead 1st time
2018-02-22SenateOn 1st reading
2018-02-21SenateReported do pass
2018-02-14SenateTo Judiciary
2018-02-14SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-02-14SenateTo Judiciary
2018-02-14SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB539 (Carry Over) 2017-03-28 - To House Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
14217aAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback