WV SB534 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-11 - From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-11 - From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Chief Technology Officer to receive confidential records and have access to an agencies' database which may contain confidential information, while accepting the responsibility to safeguard this information as defined by applicable law; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Authorizing Chief Technology Officer obtain certain confidential information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-11 | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar | |
2009-04-11 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2009-04-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-10 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2009-04-09 | Read 1st time | |
2009-04-09 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2009-04-08 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2009-04-08 | Do pass | |
2009-04-01 | To House Government Organization | |
2009-04-01 | To Government Organization then Judiciary | |
2009-04-01 | Introduced in House | |
2009-04-01 | Ordered to House | |
2009-04-01 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 24) | |
2009-04-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-01 | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) | |
2009-04-01 | On 3rd reading with right to amend | |
2009-04-01 | Unanimous consent | |
2009-03-31 | On 3rd reading | |
2009-03-31 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-03-31 | On 2nd reading | |
2009-03-30 | Read 1st time | |
2009-03-30 | On 1st reading | |
2009-03-30 | Immediate consideration | |
2009-03-30 | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported | |
2009-03-26 | On second reading to Judiciary | |
2009-03-26 | Read 1st time | |
2009-03-26 | On 1st reading | |
2009-03-26 | Immediate consideration | |
2009-03-26 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary | |
2009-03-10 | To Government Organization | |
2009-03-10 | To Government Organization then Judiciary | |
2009-03-10 | Introduced in Senate | |
2009-03-10 | To Government Organization then Judiciary | |
2009-03-10 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3049 (Same As) 2009-03-10 - To House Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5A | 6 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5A | 7 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=534&year=2009&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |