WV SB531 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to incomplete, duplicative, or redundant claims for refund
Title
Relating to incomplete, duplicative, or redundant claims for refund
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Tarr [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2021 (Roll No. 153) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 153) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 153) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | To House Finance |
2021-03-22 | House | To Finance |
2021-03-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2021 (Roll No. 153) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 153) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-19 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-18 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-17 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-03-02 | Senate | To Finance |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-02 | Senate | To Finance |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 10 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 10 | 14e | New Code | See Bill Text |