WV SB502 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 226, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 226, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to eligibility for certain reclamation or remediation tax credit
Title
Relating to eligibility for certain reclamation or remediation tax credit
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Ryan Ferns [R] | Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Art Kirkendoll [D] |
Sen. Kent Leonhardt [R] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Roman Prezioso [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 431) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 9) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 431) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 9) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 226, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/18/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/15 |
2015-03-13 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 2) |
2015-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 431) |
2015-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-11 | House | From House Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2015-03-11 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on House Calender |
2015-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-03 | House | Amended to include the provisions of H. B. 2816 |
2015-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-02 | House | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-02 | House | Reference dispensed |
2015-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 9) |
2015-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-26 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2015-02-17 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-17 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2816 (Same As) 2015-03-14 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 3 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |