WV HB2816 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-14 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-14 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to specify that a tax credit may not be granted for reclamation or remediation performed prior to July 13, 2013, unless a written application for the tax credit was submitted to the Tax Commissioner prior to September 1, 2014.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of a mine operator to receive a tax credit for performing reclamation or remediation at a bond forfeiture site
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-14 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on House Calender |
2015-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-03 | House | Laid over on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/4/15 |
2015-03-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-02 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-27 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2015-02-27 | House | Do pass |
2015-02-27 | House | To House Finance |
2015-02-27 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2015-02-19 | House | To House Energy |
2015-02-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-19 | House | To Energy then Finance |
2015-02-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB502 (Same As) 2015-04-15 - Chapter 226, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 3 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |