WV SB492 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-16 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-16 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow restaurants, private clubs, mini-distilleries and wineries to sell alcoholic beverages at ten o’clock a.m. on Sundays.
Title
Relating to sale of alcoholic beverages on Sundays prior to 1 p.m.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Bob Williams [D] | Sen. Daniel Hall [D] | Sen. Ronald Miller [D] |
Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Chris Walters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-16 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-16 | Senate | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB42 (Similar To) 2015-02-20 - To House Judiciary
HB2804 (Similar To) 2015-02-18 - To House Judiciary
HB2944 (Similar To) 2015-02-24 - To House Judiciary
HB2804 (Similar To) 2015-02-18 - To House Judiciary
HB2944 (Similar To) 2015-02-24 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 16 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 3A | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 8 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |