WV SB482 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 73, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 73, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill concerns the preparation and sale of voter registration lists. The bill exempts certain voter data from being provided. The bill permits voter lists be obtained for noncommercial purposes at a cost of the actual costs of producing the list. The bill sets forth the fees to be charged for the sale of voter registration lists. The bill sets forth the types of lists and services that are available. The bill requires the net proceeds from the sales of voter registration lists be deposited in the State Election Fund. The bill clarifies that the Secretary of State may share voter information with those authorized to receive the information.
Title
Relating to sale of voter registration lists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 79) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 342) (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 342) (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 73, Acts, Regular Session, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 5/3/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/3/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/3/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 5/1/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 5/1/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-05-01 | Senate | To Governor 5/1/13 |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 79) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 342) |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-09 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2013-04-08 | House | To House Finance |
2013-04-08 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2013-04-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-04-01 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2013-04-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 3rd reading |
2013-03-29 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-27 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2013-03-14 | Senate | To Finance |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2013-03-07 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-07 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2863 (Same As) 2013-03-07 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 1 | 2b | New Code | See Bill Text |