WV SB473 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 165, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 165, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting collection and sale of naturally shed deer antlers
Title
Permitting collection and sale of naturally shed deer antlers
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Maynard [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 285) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 86) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 86) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 165, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 |
2017-04-07 | House | To Governor 4/6/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-06 | Senate | To Governor 4/6/17 |
2017-04-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-31 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-03-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-31 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 285) |
2017-03-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-31 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-30 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-29 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-28 | House | Do pass |
2017-03-13 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-03-13 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-03-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 86) |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2017-02-28 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-28 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2707 (Similar To) 2017-03-08 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |