WV SB471 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 113, Acts, Regular Session, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 113, Acts, Regular Session, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing Supreme Court establish mental hygiene commissioners' compensation
Title
Authorizing Supreme Court establish mental hygiene commissioners' compensation
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Edgell [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Kessler [D] | Sen. Orphy Klempa [D] | Sen. William Laird [D] |
Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] | Sen. Gregory Tucker [D] | Sen. John Unger [D] | Sen. Mark Wills [D] |
Sen. Jack Yost [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 259) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 258) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 258) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 113, Acts, Regular Session, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/15/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/15/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor 3/15/12 | |
2012-03-08 | House Message received | |
2012-03-07 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-07 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 259) | |
2012-03-07 | Passed House (Roll No. 258) | |
2012-03-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-07 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-06 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-05 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-05 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-03-02 | Do pass | |
2012-02-20 | To House Finance | |
2012-02-20 | To Finance | |
2012-02-20 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-17 | Ordered to House | |
2012-02-17 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) | |
2012-02-17 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) | |
2012-02-17 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-17 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-02-16 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-16 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-02-15 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-15 | On 1st reading | |
2012-02-14 | Reported do pass | |
2012-02-09 | To Finance | |
2012-02-09 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance | |
2012-02-01 | To Judiciary | |
2012-02-01 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-01 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2012-02-01 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4292 (Same As) 2012-01-27 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |