WV SB464 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Rejected by Senate (Roll No. 268)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Modifying licensing requirements for telemedicine and surgery or podiatry

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifying licensing requirements for telemedicine and surgery or podiatry

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Rejected by Senate (Roll No. 268) (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27SenateRejected by Senate (Roll No. 268)
2019-02-27SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-27SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-26SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-25SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-25SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-23SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-29SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-29SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB3089 (Similar To) 2019-02-12 - To House Health and Human Resources

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301412dAmended CodeCitation Text
30313Amended CodeCitation Text
30313aAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback