WV SB449 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prohibit the imposition of preexisting condition limitations on employees under the West Virginia Public Employees Insurance Act, while limiting the occasions upon which employees may enroll or make benefit changes.
Title
Relating to PEIA preexisting conditions limitations
Sponsors
Sen. Walt Helmick [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Kessler [D] | Sen. Joseph Minard [D] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] |
Sen. John Unger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-11 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 163, Acts, Regular Session, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-04-02 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 4/1/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 4/1/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-04-01 | To Governor 4/1/10 | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to House | |
2010-03-13 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 82) | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-13 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-13 | Passed House (Roll No. 367) | |
2010-03-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-13 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-11 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-10 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-03-09 | With amendment, do pass | |
2010-03-02 | To House Finance | |
2010-03-02 | To Finance | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced in House | |
2010-03-01 | Ordered to House | |
2010-03-01 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) | |
2010-03-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-01 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-02-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-02-26 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-02-25 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-25 | On 1st reading | |
2010-02-24 | Reported do pass | |
2010-02-11 | To Finance | |
2010-02-11 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance | |
2010-02-02 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-02 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-02-02 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2010-02-02 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4300 (Same As) 2010-02-02 - To House Banking and Insurance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 16 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=449&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |