WV SB440 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing Library Facilities Improvement Fund
Title
Establishing Library Facilities Improvement Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] |
Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 100) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | To House Government Organization |
2018-02-13 | House | To Government Organization |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 100) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2018-01-31 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-31 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |