WV SB439 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 118, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 118, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminating requirement that budget director approve requisitions for personal services payment under certain circumstances
Title
Eliminating requirement that budget director approve requisitions for personal services payment under certain circumstances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 418) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 129) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 129) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 118, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/21/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/21/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/21/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/15/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/15/16 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 418) |
2016-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-04 | House | Do pass |
2016-02-18 | House | To House Finance |
2016-02-18 | House | To Finance |
2016-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 129) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-17 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-16 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-15 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-02-01 | Senate | To Finance |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-01 | Senate | To Finance |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11B | 2 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |