WV SB437 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Updating and clarifying code relating to rules governing mixed martial arts
Title
Updating and clarifying code relating to rules governing mixed martial arts
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Blair [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 399) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment as amended and passed bill (Roll No. 307) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 380) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 82) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment as amended and passed bill (Roll No. 307) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 380) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 82) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | House | Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/28/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-28 | Senate | To Governor 3/28/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/28/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate agrees to the return |
2016-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | House requested return of the measure from Senate |
2016-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 399) |
2016-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate title amendment |
2016-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment as amended and passed bill (Roll No. 307) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Title amendment adopted |
2016-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 380) |
2016-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-04 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-03-03 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-02 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2016-02-12 | House | To House Government Organization |
2016-02-15 | House | To Government Organization |
2016-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 82) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-09 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-02-01 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-01 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 5A | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 5A | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 5A | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |