WV SB390 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - To House Technology and Infrastructure
Pending: House Technology and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - To House Technology and Infrastructure
Pending: House Technology and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring electric utilities submit feasibility studies of constructing and operating middle-mile broadband internet projects
Title
Requiring electric utilities submit feasibility studies of constructing and operating middle-mile broadband internet projects
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Maynard [R] | Sen. Eric Tarr [R] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 59) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 59) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 59) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2019-02-04 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 59) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 59) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reported by clerk |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 1/31/19 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported by clerk |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 1/30/19 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-29 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-22 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-22 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31G | 4 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31G | 5 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31G | 5 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |