WV SB390 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create a new crime relating to the invasion of personal privacy on a computer.
Title
Adding web-enabled mobile devices to crime of invasion of privacy on computer
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Kessler [D] | Sen. Orphy Klempa [D] | Sen. Brooks McCabe [D] |
Sen. Joseph Minard [D] | Sen. Herb Snyder [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Erik Wells [D] |
Sen. Jack Yost [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-02-22 | To Judiciary | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-21 | Ordered to House | |
2011-02-21 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) | |
2011-02-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-21 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-02-18 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-18 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-02-17 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-17 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-16 | Committee substitute reported | |
2011-02-02 | To Judiciary | |
2011-02-02 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-02 | To Judiciary | |
2011-02-02 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 3C | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |