WV SB39 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting insurance coverage from requiring prior authorization for tests to stage cancer
Title
Prohibiting insurance coverage from requiring prior authorization for tests to stage cancer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 97) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2021-03-10 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 97) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-02-24 | Senate | To Finance |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2021-02-10 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-10 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 15 | 4x | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 16 | 3kk | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 24 | 7x | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 25 | 8u | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 25A | 8x | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 16 | 8b | New Code | See Bill Text |