WV SB385 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB385

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 16, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Decreasing and adding appropriations out of Treasury to DHHR and MAPS

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Decreasing and adding appropriations out of Treasury to DHHR and MAPS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 404) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 403) (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 45) (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate rejects effective date (Roll No. 41) (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 40) (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateChapter 16, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
2018-03-10HouseApproved by Governor 3/15/18 - House Journal
2018-03-10SenateApproved by Governor 3/15/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-15SenateApproved by Governor 3/15/18
2018-03-10HouseTo Governor 3/14/18 - House Journal
2018-03-10SenateTo Governor 31418 - Senate Journal
2018-03-14SenateTo Governor 3/14/18
2018-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-08HouseCompleted legislative action
2018-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-08HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 404)
2018-03-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 403)
2018-03-08HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-08HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-07HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-07HousePlaced on Special Calender
2018-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, House Calendar
2018-02-15HousePlaced on House Calender
2018-02-15HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-14HouseRead 1st time
2018-02-14HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-13HouseDo pass
2018-02-01HouseTo House Finance
2018-02-01HouseTo Finance
2018-02-01HouseIntroduced in House
2018-01-31SenateOrdered to House
2018-01-31SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 45)
2018-01-31SenateSenate reconsidered effective date
2018-01-31SenateOrdered to House
2018-01-31SenateSenate rejects effective date (Roll No. 41)
2018-01-31SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 40)
2018-01-31SenateRead 3rd time
2018-01-31SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-01-30SenateRead 2nd time
2018-01-30SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-01-29SenateRead 1st time
2018-01-29SenateOn 1st reading
2018-01-26SenateReported do pass
2018-01-25SenateTo Finance
2018-01-25SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-01-25SenateTo Finance
2018-01-25SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB385 (Carry Over) 2017-02-21 - To Health and Human Resources
HB4387 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - To House Finance

Subjects


West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback