WV SB373 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 175, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 175, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow an image displayed on a wireless communication device to serve as proof of insurance on a motor vehicle.
Title
Allowing wireless communication image serve as proof of motor vehicle insurance
Sponsors
Sen. David Nohe [R] | Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Daniel Hall [D] | Sen. Robert Karnes [R] |
Sen. Craig Blair [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 538) (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 537) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 13) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 537) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 13) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 175, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/18/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/18/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/18/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/15 |
2015-03-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-13 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 538) |
2015-03-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-13 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 537) |
2015-03-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-12 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-12 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-11 | House | Do pass |
2015-03-06 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-03-06 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2015-02-25 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2015-02-25 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate reconsidered passage of bill (Voice vote) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 13) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2015-02-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2015-01-30 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-01-30 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17D | 2A | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |