WV SB364 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB364

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 70, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Allowing parent or legal guardian of homeschooled child provide signed statement for obtaining permit or license to operate motor vehicle

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing parent or legal guardian of homeschooled child provide signed statement for obtaining permit or license to operate motor vehicle

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 284) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 64) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateChapter 70, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
2018-03-10SenateApproved by Governor 3/20/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-20SenateApproved by Governor 3/20/18
2018-03-10HouseApproved by Governor 3/20/18 - House Journal
2018-03-10HouseTo Governor 3/9/18 - House Journal
2018-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/9/18
2018-03-03SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-02HouseCompleted legislative action
2018-03-02HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-02HousePassed House (Roll No. 284)
2018-03-02HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-02HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-01HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-01HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-28HouseRead 1st time
2018-02-28HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-27HouseDo pass
2018-02-06HouseTo House Judiciary
2018-02-06HouseTo Judiciary
2018-02-06HouseIntroduced in House
2018-02-05SenateOrdered to House
2018-02-05SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 64)
2018-02-05SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-05SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-02-02SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-02SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-02-01SenateRead 1st time
2018-02-01SenateOn 1st reading
2018-01-31SenateReported do pass
2018-01-24SenateTo Education
2018-01-24SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-01-24SenateTo Education
2018-01-24SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB364 (Carry Over) 2017-05-23 - Chapter 233, Acts, Regular Session, 2017

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18811Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback