WV SB355 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 113, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 113, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require final payment of wages of discharged employees no later than the next regular payday. Payment may be made through regular means or by mail. An employee may also provide written notice of intention to quit at least one pay period before quitting to receive all wages he or she earned at the time of quitting.
Title
Relating to final wage payment to discharged employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 69) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 315) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 315) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 113, Acts, Regular Session, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/26/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/25/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-26 | Senate | To Governor 4/26/13 |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 69) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 315) |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-11 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-09 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2013-04-04 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-04-04 | House | To Judiciary |
2013-04-04 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2013-04-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2013-03-20 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Judiciary |
2013-02-22 | Senate | To Labor |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-02-22 | Senate | To Labor then Judiciary |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |