WV SB326 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 32, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 32, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Repeal, revise, relocate and recodify law relating to contributing to delinquency of minor child
Title
Repeal and recodify law relating to contributing to delinquency of minor child
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Kessler [D] | Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] | Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] |
Sen. Michael Romano [D] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 381) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 442) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 65) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 442) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 65) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 32, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/22/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/16 |
2016-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 381) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 442) |
2016-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-08 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-03-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-05 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2016-02-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-02-08 | House | To Judiciary |
2016-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-06 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 65) |
2016-02-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-04 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2016-01-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 4 | 901 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
49 | 4 | 902 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 8D | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |