WV SB300 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 322, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 322, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Updating certain terms in WV Corporation Net Income Tax Act
Title
Updating certain terms in WV Corporation Net Income Tax Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-14 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 186) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 185) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 65) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 65) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 185) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 65) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 65) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 322, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Approved by Governor 3/2/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/2/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | To Governor 2/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-02-25 | Senate | To Governor 2/25/20 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-02-14 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-02-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-14 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 186) |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 185) |
2020-02-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-14 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-12 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-12 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-11 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-06 | House | To House Finance |
2020-02-06 | House | To Finance |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 65) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 65) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-01-10 | Senate | To Finance |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-10 | Senate | To Finance |
2020-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 24 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |