WV SB28 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-01 - Referred to Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Removing hotel occupancy tax limit collects for medical care and emergency services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removing hotel occupancy tax limit collects for medical care and emergency services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 52) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Rules
2019-02-01SenateHouse Message received
2019-01-31HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-01-31HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-01-31HousePassed House (Roll No. 52)
2019-01-31HouseRead 3rd time
2019-01-31HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-30HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-01-30HouseRead 2nd time
2019-01-30HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-29HouseRead 1st time
2019-01-29HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-28HouseWith amendment, do pass
2019-01-17HouseTo House Finance
2019-01-17HouseTo Finance
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-16SenateOrdered to House
2019-01-16SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 4)
2019-01-16SenateRead 3rd time
2019-01-16SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-01-15SenateRead 2nd time
2019-01-15SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-01-14SenateRead 1st time
2019-01-14SenateOn 1st reading
2019-01-11SenateReported do pass
2019-01-09SenateTo Finance
2019-01-09SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-09SenateTo Finance
2019-01-09SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
71814Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback