WV SB248 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring DHHR collaborate with Workforce Development Board and WV Division of Personnel for purposes of job placement
Title
Requiring DHHR collaborate with Workforce Development Board and WV Division of Personnel for purposes of job placement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 60) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | To House Government Organization |
2021-03-25 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2021-03-03 | House | To House Workforce Development |
2021-03-03 | House | To Workforce Development then Government Organization |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 60) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-02-26 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2021-02-12 | Senate | To Workforce |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-12 | Senate | To Workforce then Finance |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |