WV SB237 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 43, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to regulate captive cervid farming as an agricultural enterprise in this state. Toward this purpose, the bill describes powers and duties of the Department of Agriculture; provides for rule-making authority; sets forth duties and obligations of the commissioner; provides for an application process; provides for the issuance, renewal, modification, and transfer of a license certificate; provides for inspection of facilities; provides for the transition of current facilities; addresses noncompliance with article and provides for certain criminal penalties and remedies due to noncompliance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating Captive Cervid Farming Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 1) (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 1) (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 72) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 71) (Y: 88 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 1) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-15SenateChapter 43, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
2015-02-27HouseApproved by Governor 2/25/15 - House Journal
2015-02-26SenateApproved by Governor 2/25/15 - Senate Journal
2015-02-25SenateApproved by Governor 2/25/15
2015-02-19HouseTo Governor 2/19/15 - House Journal
2015-02-19SenateTo Governor 2/19/15
2015-02-16HouseHouse received Senate message
2015-02-13SenateCompleted legislative action
2015-02-13SenateCommunicated to House
2015-02-13SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 1)
2015-02-13SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 1)
2015-02-13SenateHouse Message received
2015-02-12HouseCommunicated to Senate
2015-02-12HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 72)
2015-02-12HousePassed House (Roll No. 71)
2015-02-12HouseRead 3rd time
2015-02-12HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2015-02-12HouseAmendment reported by the Clerk
2015-02-12HouseAmendment withdrawn (Voice vote)
2015-02-12HouseAmendment withdrawn (Voice vote)
2015-02-12HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2015-02-12HouseAmendment reported by the Clerk
2015-02-12HouseOn 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, Daily Calender
2015-02-11HouseAmendments pending
2015-02-11HouseRead 2nd time
2015-02-11HouseOn 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
2015-02-10HouseRead 1st time
2015-02-10HouseOn 1st reading, Daily Calendar
2015-02-09HouseWith amendment, do pass
2015-02-02HouseTo House Finance
2015-02-02HouseTo Finance
2015-02-02HouseIntroduced in House
2015-01-30SenateOrdered to House
2015-01-30SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 1)
2015-01-30SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 1)
2015-01-30SenateRead 3rd time
2015-01-30SenateOn 3rd reading
2015-01-29SenateRead 2nd time
2015-01-29SenateOn 2nd reading
2015-01-28SenateRead 1st time
2015-01-28SenateOn 1st reading
2015-01-27SenateCommittee reference dispensed
2015-01-27SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Finance
2015-01-16SenateTo Agriculture and Rural Development
2015-01-16SenateIntroduced in Senate
2015-01-16SenateTo Agriculture and Rural Development then Finance
2015-01-16SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2033 (Similar To) 2015-01-14 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19292Amended CodeCitation Text
192H1New CodeSee Bill Text
192H10New CodeSee Bill Text
192H11New CodeSee Bill Text
192H12New CodeSee Bill Text
192H13New CodeSee Bill Text
192H14New CodeSee Bill Text
192H15New CodeSee Bill Text
192H2New CodeSee Bill Text
192H3New CodeSee Bill Text
192H4New CodeSee Bill Text
192H5New CodeSee Bill Text
192H6New CodeSee Bill Text
192H7New CodeSee Bill Text
192H8New CodeSee Bill Text
192H9New CodeSee Bill Text
2012Amended CodeCitation Text
20211Amended CodeCitation Text
20212Amended CodeCitation Text
242F10Amended CodeCitation Text
242F3Amended CodeCitation Text
242F4Amended CodeCitation Text
242F5Amended CodeCitation Text
242F6Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=237&year=2015&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb237%20intr.htm&yr=2015&sesstype=RS&i=237
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB237%20SUB1.htm&yr=2015&sesstype=RS&i=237
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB237%20SUB1%20enr.pdf&yr=2015&sesstype=RS&i=237
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB237%20SUB1%20enr.htm&yr=2015&sesstype=RS&i=237
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/senate/01-30-0001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/house/00071.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/house/00072.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2015/RS/votes/senate/02-13-0001.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback