WV SB209 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 55, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 55, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require county boards of education to allow students with special needs to participate in graduation ceremonies with their peers. The bill prohibits county boards from denying special needs services to a student due to participating in the graduation ceremonies.
Title
Allowing special needs students to participate in graduation ceremonies
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Ronald Miller [D] | Sen. Donald Cookman [D] | Sen. Chris Walters [R] |
Sen. Rocky Fitzsimmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 22) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 22) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 259) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 258) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 22) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 259) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 258) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 55, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/27/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-27 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/14 |
2014-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 22) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 22) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 259) |
2014-03-05 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 258) |
2014-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-04 | House | Sub. amend. for committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-04 | House | Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) |
2014-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-03 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-28 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2014-01-29 | House | To House Education |
2014-01-29 | House | To Education |
2014-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 1/27/14 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-01-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-01-23 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Education |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Education |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 20 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5 | 48 | New Code | See Bill Text |