WV SB2008 | 2010 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-21 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-21 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide for annual evaluations of professional personnel in schools.
Title
Relating to annual professional personnel evaluations in public schools
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Hall [R] | Sen. Earl Tomblin [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-07-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 510) (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 509) (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 509) (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-07-21 | House insisted on position (Voice vote) | |
2010-07-21 | House received Senate message | |
2010-07-21 | Communicated to House | |
2010-07-21 | Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote) | |
2010-07-21 | House Message received | |
2010-07-21 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-07-21 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 510) | |
2010-07-21 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-07-21 | Passed House (Roll No. 509) | |
2010-07-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-07-21 | On 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2010-07-20 | Amended to include the provisions of Eng. Com. Sub. for H. B. 208 | |
2010-07-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-07-20 | On 2nd reading, House Calendar | |
2010-07-19 | Read 1st time | |
2010-07-19 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-07-19 | Reference dispensed | |
2010-07-19 | Introduced in House | |
2010-07-18 | Ordered to House | |
2010-07-18 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 10) | |
2010-07-18 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) | |
2010-07-18 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-07-18 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-07-18 | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-07-18 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-07-18 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 9) | |
2010-07-18 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-07-18 | Read 1st time | |
2010-07-18 | On 1st reading | |
2010-07-18 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-07-18 | Reported do pass, with amendments | |
2010-07-17 | To Education | |
2010-07-17 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-07-17 | To Education | |
2010-07-17 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18A | 2 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 2 | 12a | Amended Code | Citation Text |