WV SB2004 | 2014 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-24 - Chapter 3, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-24 - Chapter 3, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing transfer of moneys to Courtesy Patrol Fund according to expenditure schedule set by Budget Office
Title
Authorizing transfer of moneys to Courtesy Patrol Fund according to expenditure schedule set by Budget Office
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 2) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 550) (Y: 78 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 549) (Y: 74 N: 16 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 548) (Y: 27 N: 63 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 6) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 5) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 2) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 550) (Y: 78 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 549) (Y: 74 N: 16 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 548) (Y: 27 N: 63 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 6) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 5) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-24 | Senate | Chapter 3, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2014 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/29/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/29/14 |
2014-05-21 | House | Approved by Governor 5/29/14 - House Journal |
2014-05-21 | House | To Governor 5/23/14 - House Journal |
2014-05-21 | Senate | To Governor 5/23/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-05-23 | Senate | To Governor 5/23/14 |
2014-05-21 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 2) |
2014-05-21 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-05-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 550) |
2014-05-21 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-05-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 549) |
2014-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-05-21 | House | Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) |
2014-05-21 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-05-21 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 548) |
2014-05-21 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Daily Calendar |
2014-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-05-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-05-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-05-19 | House | Immediate consideration |
2014-05-19 | House | Reference dispensed |
2014-05-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 6) |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 5) |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2014-05-19 | Senate | To Finance |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-05-19 | Senate | To Finance |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
hb204 (Same As) 2014-05-21 - Passed over
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5B | 2 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |