WV SB194 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 100, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 100, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to repeal the purchasing exemption provided to the Medicaid program. This bill has been recommended for passage during the 2013 Regular Session by the Joint Committee on Health.
Title
Relating to DHHR contract procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 65) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 65) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 299) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 298) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 65) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 299) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 298) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 100, Acts, Regular Session, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/25/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-25 | Senate | To Governor 4/25/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/25/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 65) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 65) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-12 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 299) |
2013-04-12 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 298) |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-09 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2013-03-06 | House | To House Finance |
2013-03-06 | House | To Finance |
2013-03-06 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 2) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass, with title amendment |
2013-02-18 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-02-18 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2455 (Same As) 2013-02-28 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 2 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 2 | 9b | Repealed Code | Citation Text |