WV SB189 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for substantial deference to state school superintendent's interpretations of school laws
Title
Providing for substantial deference to state school superintendent's interpretations of school laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 75) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | House | To House Education |
2024-01-31 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 75) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-29 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-01-26 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2024-01-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 3 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |