WV SB175 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 161, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 161, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
DHHR rule relating to collection and exchange of overdose data
Title
Authorizing DHHR promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 366) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 366) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 447) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 446) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 83) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 83) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 366) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 447) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 446) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 83) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 83) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 161, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/20/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-20 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/19 |
2019-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 366) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 366) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 447) |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 446) |
2019-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-02 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-01 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-02-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-20 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-07 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 83) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 83) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-10 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2243 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |