WV SB151 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - To House Technology and Infrastructure
Pending: House Technology and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - To House Technology and Infrastructure
Pending: House Technology and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating license plate recognizing linemen
Title
Creating license plate recognizing linemen
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 58) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2022-02-01 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Government Organization |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 58) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-01-31 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-28 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-01-27 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2022-01-12 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-12 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB192 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - To House Technology and Infrastructure
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17A | 3 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |