WV SB1012 | 2019 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by Governor 5/29/19 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by Governor 5/29/19 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating voluntary certification of recovery residences
Title
Creating voluntary certification of recovery residences
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 797) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 796) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 795) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 11) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 11) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 10) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 796) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 795) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 11) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 11) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 10) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/29/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/29/19 |
2019-06-01 | Senate | To Governor 5/24/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-05-24 | Senate | To Governor 5/24/19 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-05-20 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-05-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 797) |
2019-05-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 796) |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 795) |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-05-20 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-05-20 | House | Reference dispensed |
2019-05-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 11) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 11) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 10) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 59 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 59 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 59 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |