WV SB1011 | 2017 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-16 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-16 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Selling Hopemont Hospital
Title
Selling Hopemont Hospital
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-16 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and rejected bill (Roll No. 58) (Y: 10 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-06-16 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 666) (Y: 70 N: 18 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 665) (Y: 51 N: 37 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 664) (Y: 76 N: 8 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 19) (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 18) (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 17) (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Motion to reject bill rejected (Roll No. 16) (Y: 11 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-06-16 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 666) (Y: 70 N: 18 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 665) (Y: 51 N: 37 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 664) (Y: 76 N: 8 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 19) (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 18) (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 17) (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Motion to reject bill rejected (Roll No. 16) (Y: 11 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment and rejected bill (Roll No. 58) |
2017-06-16 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-06-16 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-06-16 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 666) |
2017-06-16 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-06-16 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 665) |
2017-06-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-06-16 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 664) |
2017-06-16 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-06-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-06-16 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-06-15 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-06-15 | House | Immediate consideration |
2017-06-15 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2017-05-24 | House | To House Finance |
2017-05-24 | House | To Finance |
2017-05-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 19) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 18) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 17) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Motion to reject bill rejected (Roll No. 16) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB114 (Similar To) 2017-05-23 - To House Finance