WV SB1006 | 2018 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Approved by Governor 6/7/18 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amending deadlines for securing deeds

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending deadlines for securing deeds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 593) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 592) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 591) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 7) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 7) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 6) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21SenateApproved by Governor 6/7/18 - Senate Journal
2018-06-07SenateApproved by Governor 6/7/18
2018-05-21SenateTo Governor 5/23/18 - Senate Journal
2018-05-23SenateTo Governor 5/23/18
2018-05-21SenateHouse Message received
2018-05-21HouseCompleted legislative action
2018-05-21HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-05-21HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 593)
2018-05-21HousePassed House (Roll No. 592)
2018-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2018-05-21HouseAmendment rejected (Voice vote)
2018-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2018-05-21HouseDispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 591)
2018-05-21HouseRead 1st time
2018-05-21HouseImmediate consideration
2018-05-21HouseReference dispensed
2018-05-21HouseIntroduced in House
2018-05-21SenateOrdered to House
2018-05-21SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 7)
2018-05-21SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 7)
2018-05-21SenateRead 3rd time
2018-05-21SenateConstitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 6)
2018-05-21SenateFloor amendments adopted (Voice vote)
2018-05-21SenateRead 2nd time
2018-05-21SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-05-20SenateRead 1st time
2018-05-20SenateCommittee reference dispensed
2018-05-20SenateImmediate consideration
2018-05-20SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-05-20SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB106 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Tabled on 2nd reading, Special Calendar

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11A319Amended CodeCitation Text
11A320Amended CodeCitation Text
11A323Amended CodeCitation Text
11A327Amended CodeCitation Text
11A355Amended CodeCitation Text
11A356Amended CodeCitation Text
11A359Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback