WV SB10 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 174, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 174, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Campus Self-Defense Act
Title
Campus Self-Defense Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 193) (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 192) (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 63) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 63) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 192) (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 63) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 63) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 174, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-02 | House | Approved by Governor 3/1/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/1/2023 |
2023-02-27 | House | To Governor 2/24/2023 - House Journal |
2023-02-24 | Senate | To Governor 2/24/2023 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-02-21 | House | Completed legislative action |
2023-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-21 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 193) |
2023-02-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 192) |
2023-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-20 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2023-02-20 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2023-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-17 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-17 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-16 | House | Do pass |
2023-01-25 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-01-25 | House | To Judiciary |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 63) |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 63) |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-01-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-01-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-01-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2023-01-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB434 (Similar To) 2023-01-23 - To Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18B | 1 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 1B | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 2A | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 2B | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 4 | 5b | New Code | See Bill Text |