WV HCR74 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-19 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-19 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defending Life by Rejecting Euthanasia
Title
Defending Life by Rejecting Euthanasia
Sponsors
Del. Pat McGeehan [R] | Del. Chris Phillips [R] | Del. Bill Ridenour [R] | Del. Doug Smith [R] |
Del. Diana Winzenreid [R] | Del. Henry Dillon [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - House - Adopted by House (Roll No. 182) (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-19 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-15 | House | Adopted by House (Roll No. 182) |
2024-02-15 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-02-15 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2024-02-14 | House | Be adopted |
2024-02-12 | House | To House Rules |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-12 | House | To Rules |
2024-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |