WV HCR44 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
U. S. Army PFC Clayton Collins Memorial Bridge
Title
U. S. Army PFC Clayton Collins Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
Del. Jeff Eldridge [D] | Del. Ralph Rodighiero [D] | Del. Rodney Miller [D] | Del. Justin Marcum [D] |
Sen. Rupert Phillips [R] | Del. Zachery Maynard [R] | Del. Shirley Love [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2018-03-08 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2018-03-07 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2018-03-07 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | Be adopted |
2018-02-05 | House | To House Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-05 | House | To Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |