WV HCR24 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing March 2, 2018 as National Speech and Debate Education Day
Title
Recognizing March 2, 2018 as National Speech and Debate Education Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-03-01 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-03-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-28 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2018-02-28 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2018-02-28 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2018-02-27 | House | Be adopted |
2018-01-22 | House | To House Rules |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-22 | House | To Rules |
2018-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |