WV HCR101 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-28 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-28 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The Historic Blue-Gray Highway
Title
The Historic Blue-Gray Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-28 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-28 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-02-27 | House | Adopted by House, Daily Calendar (Voice vote) |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2014-02-27 | House | On Unfinished Business, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-26 | House | Be adopted |
2014-02-20 | House | To House Rules |
2014-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-20 | House | To Rules |
2014-02-20 | House | Filed for introduction |