WV HB5647 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-24 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-24 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to increase and maintain the bracketed tax rates on the privilege of establishing or operating a health maintenance organization, specify effective dates, and provide a process for rates to be certified to the tax commissioner and require notice to be provided.
Title
Increasing and maintaining the bracketed tax rates on the privilege of establishing or operating a health maintenance organization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 282) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-24 | Senate | To Finance |
2024-02-24 | Senate | To Finance |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 282) |
2024-02-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | Do pass |
2024-02-13 | House | To House Finance |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-13 | House | To Finance |
2024-02-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 27 | 10a | Amended Code | Citation Text |