WV HB5340 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-29 - To Banking and Insurance
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-29 - To Banking and Insurance
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require insurance coverage to not prioritize the use of an opioid over a nonopioid drug for the treatment of pain.
Title
Relating to requiring insurance coverage for a nonopioid drug for the treatment of pain for patients with substance use disorder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 377) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 343) (Y: 16 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2024-02-27 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 343) (Y: 16 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2024-02-29 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Finance |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 377) |
2024-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-27 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 343) |
2024-02-27 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-02-27 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-27 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-02-14 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-14 | House | Do pass, but first to Health and Human Resources |
2024-01-30 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2024-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-30 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Health and Human Resources |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 54 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 54 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |