WV HB5318 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-19 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-19 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify that elected municipal police chiefs shall be certified law-enforcement officers.
Title
Clarifying that elected municipal police chiefs shall be certified law-enforcement officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 196) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 181) (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 181) (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2024-02-19 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-15 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 196) |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-14 | House | Amendment adopted (Roll No. 181) |
2024-02-14 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-12 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-01-29 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-29 | House | To Judiciary |
2024-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 29 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |