WV HB4953 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-07 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-07 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing the PSC with authority to order the acquisition of failing utilities and a variety of tools to assist distressed and failing utilities
Title
Providing the PSC with authority to order the acquisition of failing utilities and a variety of tools to assist distressed and failing utilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2020-02-27 | House | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2020-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2020-02-21 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-11 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-11 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2020-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 13 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 13A | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
24 | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
24 | 2 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
24 | 2 | 4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
24 | 2H | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
24 | 2H | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
24 | 2H | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
24 | 2H | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
24 | 2H | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
24 | 2H | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
24 | 2H | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
24 | 2H | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
24 | 2H | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 15A | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 12 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 16 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 19 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 20 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |